EP0241327 - Sense amplifier for programmable read only memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1993 [1993/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeuchi, Atsushi Shirakaba-kopo 201, 3-22, Nishiikuta 4-chome Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 214 / JP | [1987/42] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 87400529.1 | 10.03.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | JP19860050579 | 10.03.1986 Original published format: JP 5057986 | [1987/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0241327 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0241327 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241327 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/06, G11C17/00 | [1987/42] | CPC: |
G11C16/26 (EP,US);
G11C17/00 (KR);
G11C7/067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/42] | Title | German: | Leseverstärker für programmierbaren Festwertspeicher | [1987/42] | English: | Sense amplifier for programmable read only memory | [1987/42] | French: | Amplificateur de lecture pour mémoire morte programmable | [1987/42] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/10] | 09.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58125283 ; | [A]EP0087006 (IBM [US]); | [A]EP0053428 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]US4376987 (HSIA YUKUN); | [A]EP0122564 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, P FIELD, Vol. 7, No. 238, October 22, 1983 The Patent Office Japanese Government page 143 P 231 & JP-A 58-125 283 (Hitachi)*, & JP58125283 A 00000000 |