EP0244295 - Immunogene isolated from molluscs, process for its preparation, diagnostic reactants for human bilharzioses, vaccines against schistosomiases and immune compositions containing this immunogene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 28, rue du Docteur Roux 75724 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR DE LILLE Rue du Professeur A. Calmette BP 245 59019 Lille Cédex / FR | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 28, rue du Docteur Roux F-75724 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR DE LILLE Rue du Professeur A. Calmette BP 245 F-59019 Lille Cédex / FR | |||
For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac F-75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grzych, Jean-Marie Les Tilleuls 1 rue Meunier, Apt. 202 F-59700 Marcq / FR | 02 /
Capron, André 58 rue du Capitaine Jasmin F-59133 Phalempin / FR | 03 /
Dissous, Colette 7 Allée des Symphorines F-59262 Sainghin en Mélantois / FR | [1987/45] | Representative(s) | Orès, Irène, et al Cabinet ORES 36,rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | Ores, Irène, et al CABINET ORES 6, Avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87400870.9 | 16.04.1987 | [1987/45] | Priority number, date | FR19860006281 | 30.04.1986 Original published format: FR 8606281 | [1987/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0244295 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07K15/14, C07H3/06, A61K39/395, A61K39/00, G01N33/569, A61K39/44, C12P21/00, C12N15/00 | [1987/45] | CPC: |
A61K39/0003 (EP);
A61K38/41 (EP);
C07K16/18 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/45] | Title | German: | Aus Weichtieren isoliertes Immunogen, Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben, diagnostische Reagenzien für menschliche Bilharziosen, Impfstoffe gegen Schistosomiasis und immunisierende Zubereitungen, die dieses Immunogen enthalten | [1987/45] | English: | Immunogene isolated from molluscs, process for its preparation, diagnostic reactants for human bilharzioses, vaccines against schistosomiases and immune compositions containing this immunogene | [1987/45] | French: | Immonugène isolé de mollusques, son procédé de préparation, réactifs de diagnostic des bilharzioses humaines, vaccins contre les schistosomiases et compositions immunisantes comprenant ledit immunogène | [1987/45] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/23] | 02.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/12] | 18.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2644149 (BEHRINGWERKE AG) | [XP] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS/RRM, vol. 32, résumé no. 69731, Philadelphia, US; J.M. GRZYCH et al.: "A protective carbohydrate epitope of schistosoma-mansoni major immunogen is expressed by keyhole limpet hemocyanin KLH", & Joint meeting of the Gesellschaft für Immunologie (Society for Immunology) and the Société Française d'Immunologie (French Society for Immunology), Strasbourg, FR, 19-22 novembre 1986, IMMUNOBIOLOGY 1986. vol. 173, no. 2-5, pages 245-246 | [XP] - NATURE, vol. 323, 2 octobre 1986, pages 443-445, MacMillan Journals Ltd, GB; C. Dissous et al.: "Schistosoma mansoni shares a protective oligosaccharide epitope with freshwater and marine snails" | [XP] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 83, résumé no. 118435, Philadelphia, US; J.M. GRZYCH et al.: "Schistosoma-mansoni shares a protective carbohydrate epitope with keyhole limpet hemocyanin", & JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE (US) 1987. vol. 165, no. 3, pages 865-878 |