EP0249534 - Method and apparatus for packaging a palletized load in a film of heat-shrinkable plastic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 27.03.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEWTEC INTERNATIONAL Boulevard Lepic F-73106 Aix-les-Bains / FR | [1987/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lehmann Eric 405 route du Chatelard F-73370 Le Bourget du Lac / FR | 02 /
Doberva Jean 4 rue d Iéna F-73100 Aix les Bains / FR | [1990/33] |
Former [1987/51] | 01 /
Lehmann Eric 405 route du Chatelard F-73370 Le Bourget du Lac / FR | ||
02 /
Doberva Jean 4 rue d Iena F-73100 Aix les Bains / FR | Representative(s) | Orès, Irène Cabinet ORES 36,rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | Ores, Irène CABINET ORES 6, Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1989/06] | Derambure, Christian Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A., 52, rue de Monceau F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1987/51] | Derambure, Christian BUGNION ASSOCIES 55, rue Boissonade F-75014 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87401242.0 | 03.06.1987 | [1987/51] | Priority number, date | FR19860008058 | 04.06.1986 Original published format: FR 8608058 | [1987/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0249534 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0249534 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/33] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0249534 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65B53/02 | [1987/51] | CPC: |
B65B53/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1987/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verpacken einer Palettenladung in eine Hülle aus wärmeschrumpffähiger Kunststoffolie | [1987/51] | English: | Method and apparatus for packaging a palletized load in a film of heat-shrinkable plastic material | [1987/51] | French: | Procédé et installation pour l'emballage d'une charge palettisée dans une housse en matière plastique thermorétractable | [1987/51] | Examination procedure | 15.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/33] | 21.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.1991
18.06.1991
ADMISSIBLE MSK-Verpackungs-Systeme GmbH Benzstrasse D-47533 Kleve / DE Opponent's representative Stark, Walter Moerser Strasse 140 47803 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.1991
18.06.1991
ADMISSIBLE MSK-Verpackungs-Systeme GmbH Benzstrasse D-47533 Kleve / DE Opponent's representative Stark, Walter, Dr.-Ing. Moerser Strasse 140 D-47803 Krefeld / DE | 05.06.1991 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 15.06.1991 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 03.07.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.10.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M07) | 08.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 15.06.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.07.1993 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.07.1993 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.10.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 07.03.1997 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 18.09.1993 | Appeal received No. T0823/93 | 15.10.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.08.1995 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M06) [1995/33] | 19.02.1996 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1996/08] | 18.10.1996 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 18.10.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.1996 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.06.1991 | CH | 30.06.1991 | LI | 30.06.1991 | LU | 30.06.1991 | NL | 01.01.1992 | [1999/52] |
Former [1992/36] | BE | 30.06.1991 | |
CH | 30.06.1991 | ||
LI | 30.06.1991 | ||
NL | 01.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/26] | CH | 30.06.1991 | |
LI | 30.06.1991 | ||
NL | 01.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/16] | CH | 30.06.1991 | |
LI | 30.06.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2480236 ; | [AD]FR2090893 ; | [AD]FR1558889 |