EP0274919 - Fastening tool acting via an intermediate anvil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.1991 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DE PROSPECTION ET D'INVENTIONS TECHNIQUES SPIT Route de Lyon 26501 Bourg-Les-Valence Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | For all designated states SOCIETE DE PROSPECTION ET D'INVENTIONS TECHNIQUES SPIT Route de Lyon F-26501 Bourg-Les-Valence Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Almeras, Roland 15 rue du Gal Chapelle F-07300 Tournon / FR | 02 /
Vernerey, Jean-Claude 9 Allée des Pétunias F-26500 Bourg-Les-Valence / FR | [1988/29] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Gérard, et al Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | Bloch, Gérard, et al 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87401447.5 | 24.06.1987 | [1988/29] | Priority number, date | FR19860018018 | 23.12.1986 Original published format: FR 8618018 | [1988/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0274919 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B25C1/14, B25C1/18 | [1988/29] | CPC: |
B25C1/14 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/29] | Title | German: | Setzgerät mit Treibkolben | [1988/29] | English: | Fastening tool acting via an intermediate anvil | [1988/29] | French: | Appareil de scellement à tir indirect | [1988/29] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 08.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/05] | 25.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/31] | 03.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3080159 (HARRY ORNER); | [X]GB934082 (OLIN MATHIESON); | [A]FR1343321 ; | [X]FR1344304 ; | [Y]FR1355370 (IMPEX ESSEN VERTRIEB); | [Y]DE1478838 (BAUER CARL FA); | [X]DE1812207 (OLIN MATHIESON); | [A]US3746235 (CRABTREE R); | [A]FR2171205 (GUNNEBO BRUKS AB [SE]); | [X]AU447009B |