EP0251908 - Programmable variable-frequency signal generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.10.1992 [1992/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DE FABRICATION D'INSTRUMENTS DE MESURE (S.F.I.M.) 13, avenue Marcel Ramolfo-Garnier F-91301 Massy / FR | [1988/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pelletier, Charlie 67, rue Jean Jaurès F-91300 Massy / FR | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87401473.1 | 25.06.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | FR19860009193 | 25.06.1986 Original published format: FR 8609193 | [1988/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0251908 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0251908 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H03B23/00 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
H03B23/00 (EP,US);
H03B2200/0092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/01] | Title | German: | Generator für die Erzeugung von variablen, programmierbaren Frequenzsignalen | [1988/01] | English: | Programmable variable-frequency signal generator | [1988/01] | French: | Dispositif générateur de signaux à fréquence variable programmable | [1988/01] | Examination procedure | 28.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/21] | 13.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5485091 ; | [A]SU596954 ; | [A]US3548320 (ROBERTS HENRY, et al); | [A]EP0088669 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 107 (E-136), 8 septembre 1979, page 97 E 36; & JP-A-54 85 091 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 07-06-1979, & JP5485091 A 00000000 | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, vol. 18, no. 23, 11 novembre 1982, pages 1017- 1019, Londres, GB; J.J. HILL et al.: "Digital method of sweep frequency generation" | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, Section R, semaine B05, résumé no. B0075B/05, 14 mars 1979, Derwent Publications Ltd., GB; & SU-A-59 69 54 (ASEL) 25-02-1978, & SU596954 A 00000000 |