EP0252842 - Method of making a tool for stamping round shaped watermark screens used to make filigranes and apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 24.04.1991 [1991/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BANQUE DE FRANCE 37-39, Quai de Dion Bouton F-92803 Puteaux / FR | [1988/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Puyplat, Olivier 66, rue d'Auteuil F-75016 Paris / FR | [1988/02] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87401604.1 | 08.07.1987 | [1988/02] | Priority number, date | FR19860010089 | 10.07.1986 Original published format: FR 8610089 | [1988/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0252842 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0252842 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B23H9/06, B41M3/10, B41C1/04 | [1988/02] | CPC: |
B23H9/06 (EP);
B41M3/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/02] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für ein Werkzeug, das zum Ziehen von Wassermarksieben runder Form dient, um Wasserzeichen herzustellen, und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | [1988/02] | English: | Method of making a tool for stamping round shaped watermark screens used to make filigranes and apparatus therefor | [1988/02] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un outil servant à l'emboutissage des toiles formaires d'une forme ronde utilisée pour réaliser des filigranes, et appareil pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé | [1988/02] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/05] | 07.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.04.1990 | [1991/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2881246 (FAIRCHILD SHERMAN M); | [Y]US3769455 (DE VOS F, et al); | [Y]BE837814 ; | [Y]CA1003049 (HALBROHR PETER, et al) |