EP0258111 - Novel neuronotrophic factor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIDIA S.p.A. Via Ponte della Fabbrica 3-A 35031 Abano Terme (Padova) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | For all designated states FIDIA S.p.A. Via Ponte della Fabbrica 3-A I-35031 Abano Terme (Padova) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Della Valle, Francesco Via Cerato 14 Padova / IT | [1988/09] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Marc-Roger Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | Hirsch, Marc-Roger Cabinet Hirsch 34 rue de Bassano F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87401795.7 | 31.07.1987 | [1988/09] | Priority number, date | IT19860048370 | 07.08.1986 Original published format: IT 4837086 | IT19860048782 | 23.12.1986 Original published format: IT 4878286 | [1988/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0258111 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0258111 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07K15/06, A61K37/02 | [1988/09] | CPC: |
C07K14/475 (EP,KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/09] | Title | German: | Neuronotrophischer Faktor | [1988/09] | English: | Novel neuronotrophic factor | [1988/09] | French: | Facteur neuronotrophique | [1988/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 24.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/51] | 28.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1993 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0082612 [ ] (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US]) |