EP0280821 - Interface between processor and special instruction processor in digital data processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.11.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard, MA 01754 / US | [1988/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rubinfeld, Paul I. 6 Heard Road Wayland Massachusetts 01778 / US | [1988/36] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o SOCIETE DE PROTECTION DES INVENTIONS 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1988/36] | Application number, filing date | 87401943.3 | 28.08.1987 | [1988/36] | Priority number, date | US19870017517 | 24.02.1987 Original published format: US 17517 | [1988/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0280821 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0280821 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38 | [1988/36] | CPC: |
G06F9/3877 (EP);
G06F13/00 (KR);
G06F9/3885 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/36] | Title | German: | Schnittstelle zwischen einem Prozessor und einem Spezialbefehl-Prozessor in einer digitalen Datenverarbeitungsanlage | [1988/36] | English: | Interface between processor and special instruction processor in digital data processing system | [1988/36] | French: | Interface entre un processeur et un processeur d'instructions spéciales dans un système de traitement numérique des données | [1988/36] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 17.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 11.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/02] | 22.08.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1994 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0092429 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) | [Y] - NEW ELECTRONICS, vol. 18, no. 19, October 1985, pages 66,69,70,72, London, GB; J.C. MATHON: "Interfacing the 32081 as a floating point peripheral" |