EP0260185 - Catalytic process for producing mercaptans from thioethers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.1991 [1991/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE ELF AQUITAINE (Production) Tour Elf, 2, Place de la Coupole, La Défense 6 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/11] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE ELF AQUITAINE (PRODUCTION) Tour Elf, 2, Place de la Coupole, La Défense 6 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arretz, Emmanuel Felix Etienne 2, rue de Cagnes F-64000 Pau / FR | [1988/11] | Representative(s) | Leboulenger, Jean, et al Atofina D.C.R.D./D.P.I. 4, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92091 Paris la Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/11] | Leboulenger, Jean, et al ATOCHEM Département Propriété Industrielle F-92091 Paris la Défense 10 Cédex 42 / FR | Application number, filing date | 87401969.8 | 02.09.1987 | [1988/11] | Priority number, date | FR19860012690 | 11.09.1986 Original published format: FR 8612690 | [1988/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0260185 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0260185 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C319/06 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
C07C319/06 (EP,US);
C07C321/04 (KR);
C07C319/18 (EP,US);
C07C321/06 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C319/06, C07C321/04 (EP,US);
C07C319/06, C07C323/52 (US,EP);
C07C319/18, C07C321/14 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/11] | C07C148/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/11] | Title | German: | Katalytisches Verfahren zur Herstellung von Merkaptanen aus Thioäthern | [1988/11] | English: | Catalytic process for producing mercaptans from thioethers | [1988/11] | French: | Procédé catalytique de production de mercaptans à partir de thioéthers | [1988/11] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1987 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 29.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4005149 (KUBICEK DONALD H); | [X]US4059636 (KUBICEK DONALD H); | [X]EP0047021 (PENNWALT CORP [US]) |