EP0263008 - Reusable screw-locking set [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1991 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.1991 [1991/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency 75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency F-75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mao, Daniel 65 impasse du Galoubet F-13300 Salon de Provence / FR | 02 /
Declercq, Marc Vieux Chemin de Lambesc F-13330 Pelissane / FR | [1988/14] | Representative(s) | Barnay, André François Cabinet Barnay 72, rue d'Hauteville B.P. 171 75463 Paris Cédex 10 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | Barnay, André François Cabinet Barnay 72, rue d'Hauteville B.P. 171 F-75463 Paris Cédex 10 / FR | Application number, filing date | 87402035.7 | 14.09.1987 | [1988/14] | Priority number, date | FR19860012850 | 15.09.1986 Original published format: FR 8612850 | [1988/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0263008 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0263008 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16B39/10 | [1988/14] | CPC: |
F16B39/10 (EP,US);
Y10S411/97 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1988/14] | Title | German: | Mehrfach verwendbare Schraubensicherungsvorrichtung | [1988/14] | English: | Reusable screw-locking set | [1988/14] | French: | Ensemble réutilisable de freinage d'écrou | [1988/14] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1987 | Examination requested [1988/14] | 03.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR341135 (HIPPOLYTE JOSEPH LA FORCE [FR]); | [A]US1414188 (ERNEST JONES JESSIE, et al); | [A]US1934439 (MESSMER HERMAN F); | [AD]US3022809 (EDWARD KOTTSIEPER); | [AD]FR2025676 (SHUR LOK CORP) |