EP0263035 - Aerial transport system with two carrying and pulling cables and staggered return pulleys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1991 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.1991 [1991/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POMAGALSKI S.A. 11, rue René Camphin 38600 Fontaine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | For all designated states POMAGALSKI S.A. 11, rue René Camphin F-38600 Fontaine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cathiard, Jean-Pierre Les Mayettes F-38360 Noyarey / FR | [1988/14] | Representative(s) | Derambure, Christian BREESE DERAMBURE MAJEROWICZ 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | Derambure, Christian Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A., 52, rue de Monceau F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1988/14] | Derambure, Christian BUGNION ASSOCIES 55, rue Boissonade F-75014 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87402194.2 | 02.10.1987 | [1988/14] | Priority number, date | FR19860013902 | 02.10.1986 Original published format: FR 8613902 | [1988/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0263035 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0263035 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B61B12/10, B61B7/04, B61B12/12 | [1988/14] | CPC: |
B61B12/105 (EP,US);
B61B12/122 (EP,US);
B61B7/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1988/14] | Title | German: | Schwebebahntransportsystem mit zwei Trage- und Zugkabeln, sowie versetzten Endstationsscheibenrädern | [1988/14] | English: | Aerial transport system with two carrying and pulling cables and staggered return pulleys | [1988/14] | French: | Installation de transport aérien à deux câbles porteurs-tracteurs à poulies décalées | [1988/14] | Examination procedure | 10.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/32] | 26.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE624829 (BLEICHERT TRANSPORTANLAGEN); | [A]DE863503 (POHLIG J AG); | [A]EP0179708 (POMAGALSKI SA [FR]) |