EP0265347 - Process and apparatus for the fluidised catalytic cracking of a hydrocarbon feed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE DE RAFFINAGE ET DE DISTRIBUTION TOTAL FRANCE 84, rue de Villiers 92300 Levallois Perret / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE DE RAFFINAGE ET DE DISTRIBUTION TOTAL FRANCE 84, rue de Villiers F-92300 Levallois Perret / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sigaud, Jean Bernard 18, boulevard de la République F-92420 Vaucresson / FR | 02 /
Demar, Michel 28, Promenade Mona Lisa F-78000 Versailles / FR | 03 /
Mauleon, Jean-Louis 22, avenue de l'Abreuvoir F-78160 Marly Le Roi / FR | [1988/17] | Representative(s) | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy F-75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87402393.0 | 23.10.1987 | [1988/17] | Priority number, date | FR19860014830 | 24.10.1986 Original published format: FR 8614830 | [1988/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0265347 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C10G11/18 | [1988/17] | CPC: |
C10G11/18 (EP);
C10G9/32 (KR);
C10G11/187 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1988/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die katalytische Wirbelschichtspaltung von Kohlenwasserstoffeinsätzen | [1988/17] | English: | Process and apparatus for the fluidised catalytic cracking of a hydrocarbon feed | [1988/17] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le craquage catalytique en lit fluidisé d'une charge d'hydrocarbures | [1988/17] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 29.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/47] | 27.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.03.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/43] | 09.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0208609 (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE [FR]); | [Y]US3896024 (NACE DONALD M); | [Y]EP0074501 (ASHLAND OIL INC [US]); | [YD]US3193494 (SANFORD ROBERT A, et al); | [A]US3692667 (MCKINNEY JOEL D, et al); | [A]US4422925 (WILLIAMS DALE [US], et al); | [A]FR2298595 (MOBIL OIL [US]) |