EP0274923 - Method of manufacturing vacuum tube sockets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1993 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.1993 [1993/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIDEOCOLOR 7, boulevard Romain-Rolland 92128 Montrouge / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | For all designated states VIDEOCOLOR 7, boulevard Romain-Rolland F-92128 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prost, Alain THOMSON-CSF SCPI 19, avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | [1988/29] | Representative(s) | Einsel, Robert, et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 30453 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | Einsel, Robert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1988/29] | Grynwald, Albert THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS 9 Place des Vosges La Défense 10 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Application number, filing date | 87402670.1 | 26.11.1987 | [1988/29] | Priority number, date | FR19860016668 | 28.11.1986 Original published format: FR 8616668 | [1988/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0274923 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0274923 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01J9/32 | [1988/29] | CPC: |
H01J9/32 (EP,US);
H01J9/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Glasfüssen für Vakuumröhren | [1988/29] | English: | Method of manufacturing vacuum tube sockets | [1988/29] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'embases pour tubes à vide | [1988/29] | Examination procedure | 08.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/05] | 26.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2342609 (ELLEFSON BENNETT S); | [A]US2374269 (BREADNER ROBERT L, et al); | [A]US3477835 (BRILL FREDERICK W, et al) |