EP0278187 - Dual-range analog-to-digital convertor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL SATMAM 113 rue Jean-Marin Naudin 92220 Bagneux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states ALCATEL SATMAM 113 rue Jean-Marin Naudin F-92220 Bagneux / FR | ||
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states SMH ALCATEL 83 boulevard de Sébastopol F-75082 Paris Cédex 02 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chou, Jau-Yi 4662 Doane Street Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 87402681.8 | 26.11.1987 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | US19860935660 | 26.11.1986 Original published format: US 935660 | [1988/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0278187 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0278187 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/18 | [1988/33] | CPC: |
G01G23/3707 (EP,US);
G01G21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/33] | Title | German: | Analog/Digital-Umsetzer mit Doppelbereich | [1988/33] | English: | Dual-range analog-to-digital convertor | [1988/33] | French: | Convertisseur analogique-numérique à double-gamme | [1988/33] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/24] | 27.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/23] | 12.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57211021 ; | [Y]DE2325654 (SHINKO DENSHI KK); | [Y]US3551839 (BARKER GEORGE E) | [A] - INSTRUM. & EXPER. TECHN., vol. 20, no. 1/2, 2nd January 1977, pages 168-171, New York, US; V.G KOZLOV et al.: "Electrometer amplifier with automatic range switching" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 67 (P-184)[1212], 19th March 1983; & JP-A-57 211 021 (TERAOKA SEIKOU K.K.) 24-12-1982, & JP57211021 A 00000000 |