EP0312669 - Sliding container provided with at least one retractable panel and method for making it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.10.1993 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 15.12.1993 [1993/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLEVAL 5 Rue de l'Avé Maria 75004 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | For all designated states POLEVAL 5 Rue de l'Avé Maria F-75004 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1989/17] | For all designated states Levasseur, Daniel 5 Alleé Pierre Brossolette F-93320 Pavillons-Sous-Bois / FR | ||
For all designated states Poggi, Paul 5 Rue de l'Avé Maria F-75004 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Levasseur, Daniel 5 Allée Pierre Brossolette F-93320 Pavillons-Sous-Bois / FR | 02 /
Poggi, Paul 5, Rue de l'Avé Maria F-75004 Paris / FR | [1990/17] |
Former [1989/17] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 12, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 95 Boulevard Beaumarchais F-75003 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87402732.9 | 02.12.1987 | [1989/17] | Priority number, date | FR19870014540 | 21.10.1987 Original published format: FR 8714540 | [1989/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0312669 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/38, B65D85/10, B65D85/56 | [1989/17] | CPC: |
B65D77/24 (EP,US);
B65D85/109 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/17] | Title | German: | Schiebebehälter mit zumindest einer einziehbaren Fläche und seine Herstellung | [1989/17] | English: | Sliding container provided with at least one retractable panel and method for making it | [1989/17] | French: | Conditionnement à glissières muni d'au moins un panneau rétractable et son procédé de fabrication | [1989/17] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/48] | 13.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/50] | 26.07.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1349780 (MONTANE MARTOS MIGUEL); | [X]US4192422 (KOTYUK BERNARD [US]) |