EP0275739 - Device for the continuous analysis of a fluid flow rate, and method for carrying it out [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES EAUX SA dite: 52 rue d'Anjou F-75384 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1988/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jouttier, Jacques rue de la Gaubardière F-45400 Semoy / FR | [1988/30] | Representative(s) | Cuer, André, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7, rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | [1991/20] |
Former [1988/30] | Cuer, André CABINET CUER 30, rue de Léningrad F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87402812.9 | 11.12.1987 | [1988/30] | Priority number, date | FR19860017717 | 18.12.1986 Original published format: FR 8617717 | [1988/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0275739 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0275739 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01F15/06, G06M3/06, G06K19/06 | [1988/30] | CPC: |
G01F15/063 (EP);
G06M3/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1988/30] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur kontinuierlichen Analyse des Durchflusses einer Flüssigkeit und Verfahren zu deren Anwendung | [1988/30] | English: | Device for the continuous analysis of a fluid flow rate, and method for carrying it out | [1988/30] | French: | Dispositif pour l'analyse en continu du débit d'un fluide et procédé pour sa mise en oeuvre | [1988/30] | Examination procedure | 25.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/42] | 22.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0199051 ; | [A]GB2159495 ; | [A]US4523460 ; | [A]FR1127633 | [A] - CONTROL & INSTRUMENTATION, vol. 5, no. 1, January 1973, pages 42-43; J. WENK et al.: "Speeding data acquisition for metering liquids" |