EP0247955 - Double panel partition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.1991 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOGAL INDUSTRIE FRANCHISE INDUSTRIELLE SOCIETE ANONYME S.I.F.I.S.A. Route de Condom Estillac F-47310 Laplume / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | For all designated states SOGAL INDUSTRIE FRANCHISE INDUSTRIELLE SOCIETE ANONYME S.I.F.I.S.A. Route de Condom Estillac F-47310 Laplume / FR | ||
Former [1987/49] | For all designated states Guerin, Georges L'Esclavissat Estillac F-47310 Laplume / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guerin, Georges Domaine de Samazan Aubiac F-47310 Laplume / FR | [1990/38] |
Former [1987/49] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [1988/44] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau Le Britannia - Tour C 20, bld Eugène Déruelle Boîte Postale 3011 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | ||
Former [1987/49] | Wind, Jacques Cabinet Germain et Maureau BP 3011 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 87420144.5 | 27.05.1987 | [1987/49] | Priority number, date | FR19860007996 | 28.05.1986 Original published format: FR 8607996 | [1987/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0247955 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0247955 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/74 | [1987/49] | CPC: |
E04B2/7401 (EP,US);
E04B2/7403 (EP,US);
E05D15/0656 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/626 (EP,US);
Y10T403/555 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/49] | Title | German: | Zweischalige Wand | [1987/49] | English: | Double panel partition | [1987/49] | French: | Paroi à doubles-panneaux | [1987/49] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 05.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 16.01.1991 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2752907 (SCHMOLZ & BICKENBACH); | [A]EP0096118 (DEBREMAEKER EGIDE JOZEF [BE], et al); | [A]FR2568914 (BIRO RENE PAUL [FR]); | [A]US4570406 (DIFAZIO JOSEPH [US]) |