EP0255455 - Package for the vertical display of various products such as textile sheets and method of manufacturing such a package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE ANONYME DES TISSUS FANTAISIE Société Anonyme dite: Boulevard de la Turdine F-69170 Tarare / FR | [1988/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vedrenne, Daniel Le Crêt Morion Saint Loup F-69490 Pontcharra Sur Turdine / FR | [1988/05] | Representative(s) | Laurent, Michel, et al Cabinet LAURENT et CHARRAS, 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/05] | Laurent, Michel, et al Cabinet LAURENT et CHARRAS, 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 F-69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 87420205.4 | 28.07.1987 | [1988/05] | Priority number, date | FR19860011161 | 29.07.1986 Original published format: FR 8611161 | [1988/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0255455 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0255455 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/32 | [1988/05] | CPC: |
B65D75/32 (EP);
B65D75/322 (EP);
B65D85/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, LU [1988/05] | Title | German: | Verpackung zur vertikalen Präsentation verschiedener Produkte, wie etwa Stoffbahnen, sowie Herstellungsverfahren für eine solche Verpackung | [1988/05] | English: | Package for the vertical display of various products such as textile sheets and method of manufacturing such a package | [1988/05] | French: | Emballage permettant de présenter verticalement des produits divers tels que des articles textiles en forme de panneau et procédé pour la réalisation d'un tel produit | [1988/05] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/39] | 02.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.07.1990 | LU | 31.07.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1991/38] | BE | 31.07.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2186913 ; | [A]FR2556575 ; | [A]FR2355484 |