EP0259236 - Double connection for the removable joint of twin pipes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.A. DES ETABLISSEMENTS STAUBLI (France) B.P. 20 183 Rue des Usines 74210 Faverges / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/10] | For all designated states S.A. DES ETABLISSEMENTS STAUBLI (France) B.P. 20 183 Rue des Usines F-74210 Faverges / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Palau, Joseph Les Perris F-74410 Duingt / FR | [1988/10] | Representative(s) | Monnier, Guy Jean, et al Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/10] | Monnier, Guy, et al Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 142-150 cours Lafayette BP 3058 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 87420228.6 | 27.08.1987 | [1988/10] | Priority number, date | FR19860012397 | 01.09.1986 Original published format: FR 8612397 | [1988/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0259236 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/00 | [1988/10] | CPC: |
F16L37/0841 (EP,US);
F16L37/086 (EP,US);
F16L37/42 (EP,US);
F16L37/56 (EP,US);
Y10S285/914 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87161 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1988/10] | Title | German: | Doppelkupplung für eine lösbare Verbindung von Zwillingsleitungen | [1988/10] | English: | Double connection for the removable joint of twin pipes | [1988/10] | French: | Raccord double pour la jonction amovible de canalisations jumelées | [1988/10] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 09.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/28] | 24.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/11] | 18.10.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4116476 (PORTER GARY K, et al); | [X]FR2400158 (BUNKER RAMO [US]); | [X]DE1801559 (WALTHER CARL KURT FA) |