EP0288648 - Adapter bus switch for improving the availability of a control unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1993 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Austruy, Pierre 7 Boulevard August Raynaud F-06100 Nice / FR | 02 /
Munier, Jean-Marie 11, Chemin des Colles F-06800 Cagnes sur Mer / FR | 03 /
Poret, Michel Les Coralines Corniche des Maurettes F-06270 Villeneuve Loubet / FR | [1988/44] | Representative(s) | Lattard, Nicole Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | Lattard, Nicole Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1988/44] | Tubiana, Max Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 87430011.4 | 22.04.1987 | [1988/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0288648 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0288648 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20 | [1988/44] | CPC: |
G06F11/2007 (EP,US);
G06F11/2005 (EP,US);
G06F11/2017 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/44] | Title | German: | Adapterbusschalter zur Verbesserung der Verfügbarkeit einer Steuereinheit | [1988/44] | English: | Adapter bus switch for improving the availability of a control unit | [1988/44] | French: | Commutateur de bus pour adaptateurs pour améliorer la disponibilité d'une unité de commande | [1988/44] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/16] | 10.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1990 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.06.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 08.07.1992 | [1997/16] |
Former [1993/11] | SE | 08.07.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0083422 (IBM [US]); | [Y]EP0164015 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 25, no. 11B, April 1983, pages 6109-6110, New York, US; R.W. CALLAHAN et al.: "Scan-loadable mode registers for multiple processor, multiple architecture systems" |