EP0274975 - Door or window locking device having means for locking the spindle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.1993 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FERCO INTERNATIONAL Usine de Ferrures de Bâtiment Société à responsabilité limitée 2, rue du Vieux-Moulin Reding F-57400 Sarrebourg / FR | [1988/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnold, André 8, rue d'Italie Reding F-57400 Sarrebourg (Moselle) / FR | [1988/29] | Representative(s) | Aubertin, François c/o Cabinet Innovations et Prestations SA 4, rue de Haguenau 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | Aubertin, François c/o Cabinet Innovations et Prestations SA 4, rue de Haguenau F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 87440081.5 | 04.12.1987 | [1988/29] | Priority number, date | FR19860017458 | 11.12.1986 Original published format: FR 8617458 | [1988/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0274975 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0274975 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E05B13/00 | [1988/29] | CPC: |
E05B13/004 (EP,US);
Y10T292/1028 (EP,US);
Y10T292/96 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/29] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsbeschlag für Tür oder Fenster mit Mitteln zum Verriegeln des Vierkantstiftes | [1988/29] | English: | Door or window locking device having means for locking the spindle | [1988/29] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage pour porte ou fenêtre comprenant des moyens de blocage du carré de manoeuvre de la poignée | [1988/29] | Examination procedure | 05.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/44] | 30.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 04.03.1992 | AT | 04.12.1992 | GB | 04.12.1992 | [2000/04] |
Former [1994/32] | AT | 04.12.1992 | |
GB | 04.12.1992 | ||
Former [1994/02] | GB | 04.12.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB364396 (CHARLES HENRY FREEMAN); | [X]CH172655 (MISTELI & BAUR [CH]); | [X]FR1263406 ; | [X]NL6901169 ; | [A]DE3231069 (CHALES DE BEAULIEU HERBERT) |