EP0230394 - Orthodontic appliance system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.08.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Connecticut 263 Farmington Avenue Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF CONNECTICUT 263 Farmington Avenue Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [1987/31] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF CONNECTICUT 213 Whetten Graduate Center, 438 Whitney Road Extensions Storrs, CT 06269-1133 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goldberg, A. Jon 74 Rumford Street West Hartford Connecticut / US | 02 /
Burstone, Charles J. 252 Old Mountain Road Farmington Connecticut / US | [1987/31] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1987/31] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 87630005.4 | 13.01.1987 | [1987/31] | Priority number, date | US19860817925 | 13.01.1986 Original published format: US 817925 | [1987/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0230394 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0230394 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0230394 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61C7/00 | [1987/31] | CPC: |
A61C7/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2929 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1987/31] | Title | German: | Zahnregulierungsvorrichtung | [1987/31] | English: | Orthodontic appliance system | [1987/31] | French: | Appareil orthodontique | [1987/31] | Examination procedure | 13.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 11.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.10.1992
27.10.1992
ADMISSIBLE DENTAURUM J.P. Winkelstroeter KG Turnstr. 31 D-75228 Ispringen / DE Opponent's representative Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al, et al Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.10.1992
27.10.1992
ADMISSIBLE DENTAURUM J.P. Winkelstroeter KG Turnstr. 31 D-75228 Ispringen / DE Opponent's representative Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner, et al, et al Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | 17.11.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.05.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 18.08.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M07) | 30.03.1995 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 09.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.05.1995 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1996/02] | CH | 15.01.1992 | |
LI | 15.01.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4037324 (ANDREASEN GEORGE F); | [AD]US4197643 (BURSTONE CHARLES J [US], et al); | [AD]US3351463 (ROZNER ALEXANDER G, et al) | Examination | US4197463 |