EP0261068 - A method of making ceramic composites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXIDE TECHNOLOGY COMPANY, LP. Tralee Industrial Park Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | For all designated states LANXIDE TECHNOLOGY COMPANY, LP. Tralee Industrial Park Newark Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lesher, Daniel H. 6 Falcon Court Wilmington Delaware 19808 / US | 02 /
Kennedy, Christopher R. 17 Welwyn Road Newark Delaware 19711 / US | 03 /
White, Danny R. 10 Betts Avenue New Castle Delaware 19720 / US | 04 /
Urquhart, Andrew W. 48 Bridleshire Road Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [1988/12] | Representative(s) | Andrae, Steffen, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Andrae, Steffen, et al Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/17] | Andrae, Steffen, Dr., et al DENNEMEYER & ASSOCIATES Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/12] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 87630188.8 | 10.09.1987 | [1988/12] | Priority number, date | US19860908473 | 17.09.1986 Original published format: US 908473 | US19870070006 | 06.07.1987 Original published format: US 70006 | [1988/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0261068 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0261068 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/65, C04B35/71 | [1988/12] | CPC: |
C04B35/652 (EP,US);
C04B35/14 (KR);
C04B35/71 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2938 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2962 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung keramischer Verbundwerkstoffe | [1988/12] | English: | A method of making ceramic composites | [1988/12] | French: | Procédé de production de matériaux composites céramiques | [1988/12] | Examination procedure | 09.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/45] | 16.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.02.1993 | GR | 10.02.1993 | NL | 10.02.1993 | SE | 10.02.1993 | ES | 21.05.1993 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 10.02.1993 | |
GR | 10.02.1993 | ||
NL | 10.02.1993 | ||
SE | 10.02.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 10.02.1993 | |
NL | 10.02.1993 | ||
SE | 10.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/38] | NL | 10.02.1993 | |
SE | 10.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/36] | SE | 10.02.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | EP0193292 [ ] (LANXIDE CORP [US]) |