EP0306587 - Heat pump system with hot water device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Tower 6304 Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Tower 6304 Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dudley, Kevin F. 15 Center Street Cazenovia New York 13035 / US | [1989/11] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 87630276.1 | 23.12.1987 | [1989/11] | Priority number, date | US19870094266 | 08.09.1987 Original published format: US 94266 | [1989/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0306587 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0306587 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0306587 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F25B13/00, F25B49/00, F25B47/00, F24D17/00 | [1989/11] | CPC: |
F25B13/00 (EP,US);
F24D17/02 (EP,US);
F25B40/04 (EP,US);
F25B47/022 (EP,US);
F25B5/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/11] | Title | German: | Wärmepumpenanlage mit Heisswasservorrichtung | [1989/11] | English: | Heat pump system with hot water device | [1989/11] | French: | Système de pompe à chaleur avec dispositif à eau chaude | [1989/11] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/03] | 18.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4336692 (ECKER AMIR L, et al); | [A]GB839337 (JOHN GIBSON & SON LTD, et al); | [AD]US4598557 (ROBINSON GLEN P [US], et al) |