EP0256970 - Device for the fast colour measuring of different samples [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.1994 [1994/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kurandt, Fritz Blankenhainer strasse 21 D-12249 Berlin / DE | [1988/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/08] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/08] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Kurfürstendamm 170 D-10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 87730087.1 | 30.07.1987 | [1988/08] | Priority number, date | DE19863626373 | 05.08.1986 Original published format: DE 3626373 | [1988/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0256970 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0256970 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0256970 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/50 | [1988/08] | CPC: |
G01J3/50 (EP,US);
G01J3/501 (EP,US);
G01N2021/3181 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1988/08] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur schnellen Farbmessung an unterschiedlichen Proben | [1988/08] | English: | Device for the fast colour measuring of different samples | [1988/08] | French: | Dispositif pour mesurer rapidement la couleur d'échantillons différents | [1988/08] | Examination procedure | 19.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/46] | 10.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 07.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60186720 ; | JP59128417 [ ]; | [Y]DE3401475 (IFM INT FLUGGERAETE MOTOREN [DE]); | [A]DE2313528 ; | [A]GB1547401 (NEKOOSA PAPERS INC); | [A]EP0081702 (KOLLMORGEN TECH CORP [US]) | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN vol. 26, no. 9, Februar 1984, Seiten 4811-4812; H.E. KORTH: "Spectrophotometric Film and Color Analyzer" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol 10, no. 38 (P-428)(2095), 14 Februar 1986; & JP 60186720 A (TATEISHI DENKI K.K.) 24 September 1985, & JP60186720 A 19850924 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 257 (P-316)(1694), 24 November 1984; & JP 59128417 A (TOPPAN ISATSU K.K.) 24 Juli 1984, & JP59128417 A 19841124 |