EP0242335 - Mixtures of optical brighteners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1992 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hefti, Heinz, Dr. Fasanenstrasse 4 CH-4153 Reinach / CH | 02 /
Artz, Klaus, Dr. Ahornstrasse 3 CH-4132 Muttenz / CH | 03 /
Weber, Kurt, Dr. Rennweg 98 CH-4052 Basel / CH | 04 /
Burdeska, Kurt, Dr. Laufenburgerstrasse 30 CH-4058 Basel / CH | 05 /
Reinehr, Dieter, Dr. Wolfsheule 10 CH-7842 Kandern / DE | [1987/43] | Application number, filing date | 87810231.8 | 10.04.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | CH19860001566 | 18.04.1986 Original published format: CH 156686 | [1987/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0242335 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0242335 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D06L3/12 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
D06L4/65 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/43] | Title | German: | Mischungen von optischen Aufhellern | [1987/43] | English: | Mixtures of optical brighteners | [1987/43] | French: | Mélanges d'agents de blanchiment optique | [1987/43] | Examination procedure | 13.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 21.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1168227 (CIBA GEIGY); | [XD]DE2602750 (SANDOZ AG); | [A]EP0136259 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) |