EP0277458 - Method and apparatus for testing hermetic seal integrity of sealed packages and containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.1992 [1992/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Croce, Carlo Peter 41 Ray Avenue Leonia, NJ 07605 / US | 02 /
Halaby, Sami Assad 292 Brook Valley Road Towaco, NJ 07082 / US | 03 /
Oefinger, Arthur Richard 497 Franklin Avenue Stratford, CT 06497 / US | [1988/32] | Representative(s) | Jones, Michael Raymond, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | Jones, Michael Raymond, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | ||
Former [1989/05] | Silbiger, Jakob, Dr. c/o CAPSUGEL AG Fabrikmattenweg 2-4 CH-4144 Arlesheim / CH | ||
Former [1988/32] | Silbiger, Jakob, Dr. c/o CAPSUGEL AG Münchensteinerstrasse 41 Postfach CH-4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 87810290.4 | 08.05.1987 | [1988/32] | Priority number, date | US19870010097 | 02.02.1987 Original published format: US 10097 | [1988/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0277458 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0277458 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/36 | [1988/32] | CPC: |
G01M3/363 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Prüfung der Luftdichtheit von verschlossenen Verpackungen und Behältnissen | [1991/16] | English: | Method and apparatus for testing hermetic seal integrity of sealed packages and containers | [1988/32] | French: | Méthode et appareil de contrôle de l'intégrité de fermeture hermétique d'emballages et récipients scellés | [1988/32] |
Former [1988/32] | Methode und Apparat zur hermetisch abgedichtete Integritätsprüfung von verschlossenen Verpackungen und Behältnissen | Examination procedure | 13.05.1987 | Examination requested [1988/32] | 15.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0198950 (ARO CORP [US]); | [A]US4117718 (HAYWARD GARY G); | [A]US4326408 (KANOH CHIYUKI); | [A]GB2059381 (DANEPAK LTD) |