EP0255478 - Tris(substituted hydroxyphenyl-thio)trithioorthoesters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.01.1990 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/05] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jenkins, Linda A. 111 West Central Boulevard Palisades Park New Jersey 07650 / US | [1988/05] | Application number, filing date | 87810407.4 | 20.07.1987 | [1988/05] | Priority number, date | US19860889044 | 25.07.1986 Original published format: US 889044 | [1988/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0255478 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C149/36, C08K5/37, C09K15/14 | [1988/05] | CPC: |
C07C323/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/375 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/05] | Title | German: | Tris(substituierte hydroxyphenylthio)trithioorthoester | [1988/05] | English: | Tris(substituted hydroxyphenyl-thio)trithioorthoesters | [1988/05] | French: | Tris(hydroxyphényl substitué thio) trithio-orho-esters | [1988/05] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 22.07.1987 | Examination requested [1988/05] | 17.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.09.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1990/10] | 22.09.1989 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1990/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]US4659762 (JENKINS LINDA A [US]); | [A]EP0152022 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) | [AD] - BULLETIN DE LA SOCIETE CHIMIQUE DE FRANCE, no. 9, 1967, pages 3233-3243, Paris, FR; G. JEMINET et al.: "Etude spectrale de mono-, bis-, tris-, tétrakis (phenylthio) méthanes influence de l'interaction entre les atomes de soufre" |