EP0269559 - Sewing machine support adjustable in height [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VISITA MTC LTD. Gartenstrasse 3 CH-7001 Chur / CH | [1988/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmeller, Michael Falkensteinweg 28 D-8962 Pfronten-Mellingen / DE | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Riederer, Conrad A. c/o Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 Postfach 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | Riederer, Conrad A., Dr. Bahnhofstrasse 10 CH-7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | Application number, filing date | 87810520.4 | 09.09.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | DE19863635700 | 21.10.1986 Original published format: DE 3635700 | [1988/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0269559 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0269559 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0269559 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | D05B75/06, B23Q1/26 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
F16C29/045 (EP,US);
B23Q1/40 (EP,US);
D05B75/06 (EP,US);
F16C2322/39 (US);
F16C2340/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/22] | Title | German: | Hubeinrichtung | [1988/22] | English: | Sewing machine support adjustable in height | [1988/22] | French: | Support réglable en hauteur | [1988/22] | Examination procedure | 27.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/30] | 27.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 08.08.1990 | FR | 08.08.1990 | GB | 08.08.1990 | GR | 08.08.1990 | IT | 08.08.1990 | NL | 08.08.1990 | SE | 08.08.1990 | AT | 09.09.1990 | LU | 30.09.1990 | ES | 19.11.1990 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/03] | BE | 08.08.1990 | |
GB | 08.08.1990 | ||
GR | 08.08.1990 | ||
IT | 08.08.1990 | ||
NL | 08.08.1990 | ||
SE | 08.08.1990 | ||
AT | 09.09.1990 | ||
LU | 30.09.1990 | ||
ES | 19.11.1990 | ||
FR | 28.12.1990 | ||
Former [2002/23] | BE | 08.08.1990 | |
GB | 08.08.1990 | ||
GR | 08.08.1990 | ||
IT | 08.08.1990 | ||
NL | 08.08.1990 | ||
SE | 08.08.1990 | ||
AT | 09.09.1990 | ||
LU | 30.09.1990 | ||
FR | 28.12.1990 | ||
Former [2000/04] | BE | 08.08.1990 | |
GB | 08.08.1990 | ||
GR | 08.08.1990 | ||
IT | 08.08.1990 | ||
NL | 08.08.1990 | ||
AT | 09.09.1990 | ||
LU | 30.09.1990 | ||
FR | 28.12.1990 | ||
Former [1999/52] | BE | 08.08.1990 | |
GB | 08.08.1990 | ||
IT | 08.08.1990 | ||
NL | 08.08.1990 | ||
AT | 09.09.1990 | ||
LU | 30.09.1990 | ||
FR | 28.12.1990 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 08.08.1990 | |
GB | 08.08.1990 | ||
IT | 08.08.1990 | ||
NL | 08.08.1990 | ||
AT | 09.09.1990 | ||
FR | 28.12.1990 | ||
Former [1992/15] | BE | 08.08.1990 | |
GB | 08.08.1990 | ||
NL | 08.08.1990 | ||
AT | 09.09.1990 | ||
FR | 28.12.1990 | ||
Former [1991/41] | BE | 08.08.1990 | |
GB | 08.08.1990 | ||
NL | 08.08.1990 | ||
FR | 28.12.1990 | ||
Former [1991/40] | BE | 08.08.1990 | |
NL | 08.08.1990 | ||
FR | 28.12.1990 | ||
Former [1991/34] | BE | 08.08.1990 | |
NL | 08.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/33] | NL | 08.08.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE807152 (AUGUST KNAPPSTEIN); | [Y]CH450870 (KEUSCH MASCHB FA L [CH]); | [A]GB1117055 (ARMAGH EQUIPMENT LTD); | [A]US4559879 (HAEUSSER HORST [DE]) |