EP0273004 - User-activated therapeutical system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/26] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heiber, Werner E. 48 Davids Way Bedford Hills New York 10507 / US | 02 /
Andriola, Robert 14 Butterfly Lane Putnam Valley New York 10579 / US | 03 /
Williams, Paul 30-15 Gentner Road Fairlawn New Jersey 07410 / US | 04 /
Ebert, Charles 554 Jeter Street Redwood City California 94063 / US | [1988/26] | Application number, filing date | 87810667.3 | 16.11.1987 | [1988/26] | Priority number, date | US19860933000 | 20.11.1986 Original published format: US 933000 | US19870014313 | 13.02.1987 Original published format: US 14313 | [1993/46] |
Former [1988/26] | US19870014313 | 13.02.1987 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0273004 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0273004 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0273004 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61M35/00 | [1988/26] | CPC: |
A61K9/703 (EP);
A61K9/7084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/32] |
Former [1988/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Benutzer-aktivierte Therapeutische Systeme | [1988/26] | English: | User-activated therapeutical system | [1988/26] | French: | Système thérapeutique activé par l'utilisateur | [1988/26] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/26] | 16.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3053255 (FRIEDRICH MEYER); | [AD]US3598122 (ZAFFARONI ALEJANDRO); | [AD]US3598123 (ZAFFARONI ALEJANDRO); | [AD]US3731683 (ZAFFARONI A); | [AD]US3734097 (ZAFFARONI A); | [AD]US3742951 (ZAFFARONI A); | [AD]US3797494 (ZAFFARONI A); | [A]US4476976 (SMITH DWIGHT [US]); | [A]DE3439239 (ASO PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]); | [A]US4597961 (ETSCORN FRANK T [US]) |