EP0269573 - Liquid photoinitiating mixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hüsler, Rinaldo, Dr. Route du Confin 52 CH-1723 Marly / CH | 02 /
Rutsch, Werner, Dr. Avenue Weck-Reynold 1 CH-1700 Fribourg / CH | 03 /
Rembold, Manfred, Dr. Im Aeschfeld 21 CH-4147 Aesch / CH | 04 /
Sitek, Franciszek, Dr. Grossmattweg 11 CH-4106 Therwil / CH | [1988/22] | Application number, filing date | 87810684.8 | 20.11.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | CH19860004734 | 26.11.1986 Original published format: CH 473486 | CH19870000416 | 05.02.1987 Original published format: CH 41687 | [1988/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0269573 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0269573 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0269573 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0269573 | Date: | 19.08.1991 | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/50, G03F7/031, G03F7/004 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
G03F7/029 (EP,US);
G03C1/00 (KR);
Y10S430/148 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/22] | G03C1/68, G03F7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/22] | Title | German: | Flüssige Photoinitiatorgemische | [1988/22] | English: | Liquid photoinitiating mixture | [1988/22] | French: | Mélange photo-initiateur liquide | [1988/22] | Examination procedure | 23.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/22] | 07.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 27.03.1991 | SE | 27.03.1991 | ES | 08.07.1991 | AT | 20.11.1991 | CH | 30.11.1991 | LI | 30.11.1991 | [2004/03] |
Former [1993/15] | NL | 27.03.1991 | |
SE | 27.03.1991 | ||
AT | 20.11.1991 | ||
CH | 30.11.1991 | ||
LI | 30.11.1991 | ||
Former [1992/41] | NL | 27.03.1991 | |
SE | 27.03.1991 | ||
CH | 30.11.1991 | ||
LI | 30.11.1991 | ||
Former [1992/03] | NL | 27.03.1991 | |
SE | 27.03.1991 | ||
Former [1991/43] | SE | 27.03.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0122223 ; | [YD]US4559371 (HUESLER RINALDO [CH], et al); | [XP]EP0242330 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) |