EP0273015 - Container with a receiving device for a vial [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1990 | Change - withdrawal | published on 08.08.1990 [1990/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIFOR S.A. 48 route d'Annecy CH-1227 Carouge / CH | [1988/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loretti, Maurice 7b, chemin du Coin de Terre CH-1219 Châtelaine / CH | 02 /
André, Jacques 53, route de Romagny CH-74100 Annemasse / CH | [1988/26] | Representative(s) | Vuille, Roman, et al c/o KIRKER & Cie S.A. 14, rue du Mont-Blanc Case Postale 1736 1211 Genève 1 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/26] | Vuille, Roman, et al c/o KIRKER & Cie S.A. 14, rue du Mont-Blanc Case Postale 1736 CH-1211 Genève 1 / CH | Application number, filing date | 87810773.9 | 22.12.1987 | [1988/26] | Priority number, date | CH19860005234 | 24.12.1986 Original published format: CH 523486 | [1988/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0273015 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0273015 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/00 | [1988/26] | CPC: |
A61J1/2089 (EP);
A61J1/10 (EP);
A61J1/201 (EP);
A61J1/2065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/26] | Title | German: | Behälter mit Aufnahmevorrichtung für ein Fläschchen | [1988/26] | English: | Container with a receiving device for a vial | [1988/26] | French: | Récipient avec dispositif récepteur d'une fioline | [1988/26] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 26.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/04] | 10.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8503432 ; | [X]US4606734 ; | [AD]EP0117489 |