EP0232231 - Heat exchanger particularly suitable for use for recovery of heat fron wet gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1991 [1991/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FONDERIE E OFFICINE SAN GIORGIO PRA S.P.A. Via G. Ratto 27 I-16157 GENOVA PRA / IT | [1987/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Orsi, Armando Via Laviosa 5B/15 I-16156 Genoa Pegli / IT | [1987/33] | Representative(s) | Notaro, Giancarlo, et al Jacobacci-Casetta & Perani S.p.A. Via Alfieri 17 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | Notaro, Giancarlo, et al c/o Jacobacci-Casetta & Perani S.p.A. Via Alfieri, 17 I-10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1987/33] | Galletti di San Cataldo, Vettor, Dr. Via XX Settembre 36 I-16121 Genova / IT | Application number, filing date | 87830043.3 | 02.02.1987 | [1987/33] | Priority number, date | IT19860012423 | 07.02.1986 Original published format: IT 1242386 | [1987/33] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0232231 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0232231 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F28F3/08, F28F3/10 | [1987/33] | CPC: |
F28F3/083 (EP);
F28F3/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, NL [1987/33] | Title | German: | Wärmeaustauscher, insbesondere geeignet für Wärmerückgewinnung aus feuchten Gasen | [1987/33] | English: | Heat exchanger particularly suitable for use for recovery of heat fron wet gases | [1987/33] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur spécialement adapté pour la récupération de chaleur de gaz humides | [1987/33] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/09] | 27.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR927384 (LJUNGSTROMS ANGTURBIN AB); | [A]GB713683 (CREAMERY PACKAGE MFG COMPANY L); | [A]CH332971 (ROSENBLADS PATENTER AB [SE]); | [A]DE1064539 (SILKEBORG MASKINFABRIK AS); | [Y]FR1378761 (SEPARATOR AB); | [A]US3195625 (THOMSON MEREDITH C); | [A]GB2056652 (GEN MOTORS CORP); | [Y]FR2523287 (LECOMTE ROBERT [FR]) |