EP0273878 - Device for converting a front-wheel-drive transmission of a motor vehicle with a transverse engine into a transmission with engageable and disengageable four-wheel drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.1990 [1990/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 I-10135 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Falzoni, Gian Luigi Via Malta, 36/10 bis I-10141 Torino / IT | 02 /
Cordero, Federico Via Passo Buole, 166 I-10135 Torino / IT | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Buzzi, Franco, et al c/o Jacobacci-Casetta & Perani S.p.A. Via Alfieri 17 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | Buzzi, Franco, et al c/o Jacobacci-Casetta & Perani S.p.A. Via Alfieri, 17 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 87830415.3 | 20.11.1987 | [1988/27] | Priority number, date | IT19860054254U | 23.12.1986 Original published format: IT 5425486 U | [1988/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0273878 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60K23/08, B60K17/34 | [1988/27] | CPC: |
B60K17/344 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1988/27] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Umwandlung eines Vorderradantriebes eines Kraftfahrzeuges mit querliegendem Motor in einen ein- und ausschaltbaren Vierradantrieb | [1988/27] | English: | Device for converting a front-wheel-drive transmission of a motor vehicle with a transverse engine into a transmission with engageable and disengageable four-wheel drive | [1988/27] | French: | Dispositif permettant de transformer en quatre roues motrices à transmission embrayable et débrayable une automobile à traction avant et moteur transversal | [1988/27] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 22.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/49] | 06.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/33] | 20.03.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0226666 [ ]; | DE3334905 [ ]; | US4431079 [ ] |