EP0235103 - A system for transporting valuable documents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1991 [1991/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S P C Swedish Protection & Consulting AB Götgatan 94 104 60 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | For all designated states S P C Swedish Protection & Consulting AB Götgatan 94 S-104 60 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Persson, Gunnar O. Porlabacken 9 S-124 45 Bandhagen / SE | [1987/36] | Representative(s) | Omming, Allan STENHAGEN PATENTBYRA AB P.O. Box 4630 116 91 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | Omming, Allan STENHAGEN PATENTBYRA AB P.O. Box 4630 S-116 91 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 87850026.3 | 27.01.1987 | [1987/36] | Priority number, date | SE19860000845 | 25.02.1986 Original published format: SE 8600845 | [1987/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0235103 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0235103 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0235103 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E05G1/10, G08B13/14 | [1987/50] | CPC: |
E05G1/10 (EP,US);
E05G1/005 (EP,US);
E05G1/14 (EP,US);
G07D11/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/36] | E05G1/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/36] | Title | German: | System zum Befördern von wertvollen Dokumenten | [1987/36] | English: | A system for transporting valuable documents | [1987/36] | French: | Système pour transporter des documents de valeur | [1987/36] | Examination procedure | 23.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/04] | 27.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 25.07.1990 | [1991/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1415669 ; | [A]US3703780 (KING GEORGE); | [A]EP0111948 (CASTELIJN & BEERENS LEDERWAREN [NL]); | [A]DE3304116 (ZAJONZ ARNOLD [DE]) |