EP0239554 - Supply system for gas burners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1992 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AKTIEBOLAGET ELECTROLUX Luxbacken 1 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | For all designated states AKTIEBOLAGET ELECTROLUX Luxbacken 1 S-105 45 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borg, Anders Erik Furuvägen 1 B S-132 52 Tyresö / SE | [1987/40] | Representative(s) | Hagelbäck, Evert Isidor, et al c/o AB Electrolux Patentavdelningen S-105 45 Stockholm / SE | [1987/40] | Application number, filing date | 87850081.8 | 13.03.1987 | [1987/40] | Priority number, date | SE19860001433 | 27.03.1986 Original published format: SE 8601433 | [1987/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0239554 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0239554 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0239554 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F24C3/12 | [1987/40] | CPC: |
F24C3/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1987/40] | Title | German: | Versorgungssystem für Gasbrenner | [1987/40] | English: | Supply system for gas burners | [1987/40] | French: | Système d'alimentation pour brûleurs à gaz | [1987/40] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 28.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/18] | 23.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 07.08.1991 | SE | 07.08.1991 | FR | 27.12.1991 | GB | 13.03.1992 | CH | 31.03.1992 | LI | 31.03.1992 | [1999/42] |
Former [1993/46] | SE | 07.08.1991 | |
FR | 27.12.1991 | ||
GB | 13.03.1992 | ||
CH | 31.03.1992 | ||
LI | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | SE | 07.08.1991 | |
FR | 27.12.1991 | ||
CH | 31.03.1992 | ||
LI | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/25] | SE | 07.08.1991 | |
FR | 27.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/13] | SE | 07.08.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2177598 (MARTIN USINES FONDERIE ARTHUR [FR]); | [Y]US1574940 (ELBERT SEXTON WILLIAM); | [A]DE1251490 ; | [A]US1962251 (RUDOLPH MAGIN) |