EP0271467 - Wooden container ready to be kindled [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.1989 [1989/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Millias, Daniel Quartier "Le Village" Juzet d'Izaut F-31160 Aspet / FR | [1988/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/24] | Representative(s) | Dellicour, Paul Office Dellicour Avenue Rogier 19/13 B-4000 Liège / BE | [1988/24] | Application number, filing date | 87870160.6 | 13.11.1987 | [1988/24] | Priority number, date | FR19860016036 | 13.11.1986 Original published format: FR 8616036 | [1988/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0271467 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C10L11/04, C10L5/44 | [1988/24] | CPC: |
C10L11/04 (EP);
C10L5/44 (EP);
Y02E50/10 (EP);
Y02E50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/24] | Title | German: | Zum Entzünden bereiter hölzerner Behälter | [1988/24] | English: | Wooden container ready to be kindled | [1988/24] | French: | Cagette de bois prête à être enflammé | [1988/24] | File destroyed: | 15.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 16.12.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/45] | 14.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR396695 ; | [Y]US2666695 (DAVID BRODY); | [A]FR2460319 ; | [A]FR2246624 ; | [A]FR404235 |