EP0261097 - Apparatus for removing snow, snow-mud, water, dirt or the like from traffic areas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kahlbacher, Anton Techn. Rat St. Johanner Strasse 48 A-6370 Kitzbühel / AT | [1988/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/12] | Representative(s) | Atzwanger, Richard Patentanwalt Nothartgasse 16 1130 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | Atzwanger, Richard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Mariahilfer Strasse 1c A-1060 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 87890138.8 | 16.06.1987 | [1988/12] | Priority number, date | AT19860002479 | 16.09.1986 Original published format: AT 247986 | AT19870000559 | 10.03.1987 Original published format: AT 55987 | [1988/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0261097 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0261097 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0261097 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E01H5/09, E01H1/10, E01H1/08, E01H1/05, B65G65/06, B65G19/22, B65G15/64 | [1988/12] | CPC: |
E01H5/08 (EP,US);
E01H1/05 (EP,US);
E01H1/0818 (EP,US);
E01H1/0845 (EP,US);
E01H1/105 (EP,US);
E01H5/092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Räumung von Verkehrsflächen von Schnee, Schneematsch, Wasser, Schmutz od.dgl. | [1988/12] | English: | Apparatus for removing snow, snow-mud, water, dirt or the like from traffic areas | [1988/12] | French: | Dispositif de déblaiement de neige, de neige fondu, d'eau, d'ordures sur les routes | [1988/12] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/48] | 17.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.09.1990 | FR | 05.09.1990 | GB | 05.09.1990 | GR | 05.09.1990 | IT | 05.09.1990 | NL | 05.09.1990 | SE | 05.09.1990 | ES | 16.12.1990 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/03] | BE | 05.09.1990 | |
GB | 05.09.1990 | ||
GR | 05.09.1990 | ||
IT | 05.09.1990 | ||
NL | 05.09.1990 | ||
SE | 05.09.1990 | ||
ES | 16.12.1990 | ||
FR | 25.01.1991 | ||
Former [2000/04] | BE | 05.09.1990 | |
GB | 05.09.1990 | ||
GR | 05.09.1990 | ||
IT | 05.09.1990 | ||
NL | 05.09.1990 | ||
SE | 05.09.1990 | ||
FR | 25.01.1991 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 05.09.1990 | |
GB | 05.09.1990 | ||
IT | 05.09.1990 | ||
NL | 05.09.1990 | ||
SE | 05.09.1990 | ||
FR | 25.01.1991 | ||
Former [1991/49] | BE | 05.09.1990 | |
GB | 05.09.1990 | ||
NL | 05.09.1990 | ||
SE | 05.09.1990 | ||
FR | 25.01.1991 | ||
Former [1991/41] | BE | 05.09.1990 | |
GB | 05.09.1990 | ||
NL | 05.09.1990 | ||
SE | 05.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/35] | BE | 05.09.1990 | |
NL | 05.09.1990 | ||
SE | 05.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/34] | NL | 05.09.1990 | |
SE | 05.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/27] | SE | 05.09.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE764710 (FRITZ BRUNO); | [Y]US2797502 (GRIFFITH JOHN H, et al); | [A]US3980174 (CONRAD RENE A); | [A]DE2849672 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [Y]DE2906672 (SCHADE MASCHF GUSTAV); | [A]EP0096929 (BEKAERT SA NV [BE]); | [A]EP0189371 (REBERLE REG TREUUNTERNEHMEN SC [LI]) |