EP0269606 - Method of and device for testing an internal-combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1992 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.1992 [1992/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVL Gesellschaft für Verbrennungskraftmaschinen und Messtechnik mbH.Prof.Dr.Dr.h.c. Hans List Kleiststrasse 48 8020 Graz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states AVL Gesellschaft für Verbrennungskraftmaschinen und Messtechnik mbH.Prof.Dr.Dr.h.c. Hans List Kleiststrasse 48 A-8020 Graz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lackner, Gerald, Dipl.-Ing. Rudolf List Gasse 29 A-8010 Graz / AT | 02 /
Denk, Heimo, Dipl.-Ing. St. Radegund-Strasse 30b A-8045 Graz / AT | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Pinter, Rudolf Pinter & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | Pinter, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Klein & Pinter OEG Fasangasse 49 A-1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 87890242.8 | 03.11.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | AT19860003150 | 25.11.1986 Original published format: AT 315086 | [1988/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0269606 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0269606 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0269606 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01L23/08 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
G01L23/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Prüfung einer Brennkraftmaschine | [1988/22] | English: | Method of and device for testing an internal-combustion engine | [1988/22] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour le contrôle d'un moteur à combustion interne | [1988/22] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/46] | 19.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE2709128 (SIEMENS AG); | [Y]DE2731249 (RCA CORP); | [A]DE2742081 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP) |