EP0248857 - PROCESS FOR THE SIMULTANEOUS DRY ABSORPTION OF S O 2 AND REDUCTION OF N O X IN FLUIDIZED BED FURNACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/51] | SIMULTANEOUS SO 2? AND NO X? DRY ABSORPTION, PREFERABLY DOWNSTREAM OF COAL BOILERS, IN PARTICULAR FLUIDIZED BED FURNACES AND FLUE DUST CLOUDS. | ||
[1990/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1991 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hölter, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Beisenstrasse 39-41 D-45964 Gladbeck / DE | [1987/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IGELBÜSCHER, Heinrich Marcq-en-Baroeul-Strasse 60 D-4390 Gladbeck / DE | 02 /
GRESCH, Heinrich Franz-Lehàr-Strasse 25 D-4600 Dortmund-Wickede / DE | 03 /
DEWERT, Heribert Bahnhofstrasse 23 D-4390 Gladbeck / DE | [1987/51] | Representative(s) | Spalthoff, Adolf, et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. A. Spalthoff, Dipl.-Ing. K. Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20 45074 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/51] | Spalthoff, Adolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. A. Spalthoff, Dipl.-Ing. K. Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20 D-45074 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87900096.6 | 02.12.1986 | [1987/51] | WO1986EP00698 | Priority number, date | DE19853543442 | 09.12.1985 Original published format: DE 3543442 | DE19863608315 | 13.03.1986 Original published format: DE 3608315 | [1987/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8703507 | Date: | 18.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0248857 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0248857 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/34 | [1987/51] | CPC: |
B01D53/60 (EP);
Y02A50/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SIMULTANEN TROCKENABSORPTION VON S O 2 UND REDUKTION VON N O X BEI DER WIRBELSCHICHTFEUERUNG | [1990/37] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE SIMULTANEOUS DRY ABSORPTION OF S O 2 AND REDUCTION OF N O X IN FLUIDIZED BED FURNACES | [1990/37] | French: | PROCEDE D'ABSORPTION A SEC DE S O 2 ET SIMULTANEMENT DE REDUCTION DE N O X EN AVAL DE FOYERS A LIT FLUIDISE | [1990/37] |
Former [1987/51] | SIMULTANE SO 2?- UND NO X?- TROCKENABSORPTION VORZUGSWEISE HINTER KOHLEKESSELN, INSBESONDERE WIRBELSCHICHTFEUERUNGEN UND FLUGSTAUBWOLKEN | ||
Former [1987/51] | SIMULTANEOUS SO 2? AND NO X? DRY ABSORPTION, PREFERABLY DOWNSTREAM OF COAL BOILERS, IN PARTICULAR FLUIDIZED BED FURNACES AND FLUE DUST CLOUDS. | ||
Former [1987/51] | ABSORPTION SIMULTANEE A SEC DE SO 2? ET DE NO X?, DE PREFERENCE EN AVAL DE CHAUDIERES A CHARBON, NOTAMMENT DE FOYERS A LIT FLUIDISE ET DE NUAGES DE CENDRES VOLANTES | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.1987 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/04] | 06.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.09.1990 | FR | 12.09.1990 | GB | 12.09.1990 | IT | 12.09.1990 | NL | 12.09.1990 | SE | 12.09.1990 | AT | 02.12.1990 | CH | 31.12.1990 | LI | 31.12.1990 | LU | 31.12.1990 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/52] | BE | 12.09.1990 | |
GB | 12.09.1990 | ||
IT | 12.09.1990 | ||
NL | 12.09.1990 | ||
SE | 12.09.1990 | ||
AT | 02.12.1990 | ||
CH | 31.12.1990 | ||
LI | 31.12.1990 | ||
LU | 31.12.1990 | ||
FR | 01.02.1991 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 12.09.1990 | |
GB | 12.09.1990 | ||
IT | 12.09.1990 | ||
NL | 12.09.1990 | ||
SE | 12.09.1990 | ||
AT | 02.12.1990 | ||
CH | 31.12.1990 | ||
LI | 31.12.1990 | ||
FR | 01.02.1991 | ||
Former [1992/29] | BE | 12.09.1990 | |
GB | 12.09.1990 | ||
NL | 12.09.1990 | ||
SE | 12.09.1990 | ||
AT | 02.12.1990 | ||
CH | 31.12.1990 | ||
LI | 31.12.1990 | ||
FR | 01.02.1991 | ||
Former [1992/05] | BE | 12.09.1990 | |
GB | 12.09.1990 | ||
NL | 12.09.1990 | ||
SE | 12.09.1990 | ||
CH | 31.12.1990 | ||
LI | 31.12.1990 | ||
FR | 01.02.1991 | ||
Former [1991/50] | BE | 12.09.1990 | |
GB | 12.09.1990 | ||
NL | 12.09.1990 | ||
SE | 12.09.1990 | ||
FR | 01.02.1991 | ||
Former [1991/41] | BE | 12.09.1990 | |
GB | 12.09.1990 | ||
NL | 12.09.1990 | ||
SE | 12.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/35] | BE | 12.09.1990 | |
NL | 12.09.1990 | ||
SE | 12.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/34] | NL | 12.09.1990 | |
SE | 12.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/27] | SE | 12.09.1990 | Cited in | International search | US4424197 [ ] (POWELL BYRON E [US], et al); | DE2532471 [ ] (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND); | DE3018743 [ ] (BERGWERKSVERBAND GMBH [DE]) |