EP0250521 - SUSPENSION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LOCWYN LIMITED North Lane Weston on the Green Oxfordshire OX6 8RG / GB | [1988/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SELWYN-SMITH, Clive Oakview Weston on the Green Oxfordshire OX6 8RG / GB | [1988/01] | Application number, filing date | 87900188.1 | 12.12.1986 | [1988/01] | WO1986GB00747 | Priority number, date | GB19850030711 | 13.12.1985 Original published format: GB 8530711 | GB19860027643 | 19.11.1986 Original published format: GB 8627643 | [1988/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8703542 | Date: | 18.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0250521 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B42F15/04 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
B42F15/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/01] | Title | German: | AUFHÄNGEVORRICHTUNG | [1988/01] | English: | SUSPENSION APPARATUS | [1988/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUSPENSION | [1988/01] | File destroyed: | 29.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 15.09.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/24] | 18.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1988/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.09.1987 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 14.09.1987 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 14.09.1987 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 14.09.1987 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 14.09.1987 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 14.09.1987 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 14.09.1987 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 14.09.1987 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 14.09.1987 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 14.09.1987 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.12.1987 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR2057238 [ ]; | DE2365353 [ ]; | FR2130984 [ ]; | DE2614206 [ ]; | FR2358277 [ ]; | GB1100965 [ ] |