EP0335861 - CATHETER WITH HIGH SPEED MOVING WORKING HEAD FOR IN-BODY SURGICAL PROCEDURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KENSEY NASH CORPORATION Marsh Creek Corporate Center 55 East Uwchlan Avenue Suite 204 Exton, PA 19341 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | For all designated states KENSEY NASH CORPORATION Marsh Creek Corporate Center 55 East Uwchlan Avenue Suite 204 Exton, PA 19341 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENSEY, Kenneth 102079 Leonard Street Hinsdale, IL 60521 / US | 02 /
NASH, John 145 Oak Street Downingtown, PA 19355 / US | [1989/41] | Representative(s) | Shaw, Laurence 5th Floor, Metropolitan House, 1 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8TG / GB | [1989/41] | Application number, filing date | 87900474.5 | 02.12.1986 | [1989/41] | WO1986US02616 | Priority number, date | US19860914954 | 03.10.1986 Original published format: US 914954 | US19860921973 | 22.10.1986 Original published format: US 921973 | [1989/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8802243 | Date: | 07.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0335861 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0335861 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22, A61B17/32 | [1989/41] | CPC: |
A61B17/320758 (EP);
A61B2017/22097 (EP);
A61B2017/320044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/41] | Title | German: | KATHETER MIT HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITS-ARBEITSKOPF FÜR CHIRURGISCHE EINGRIFFE IM KÖRPERINNERN | [1989/41] | English: | CATHETER WITH HIGH SPEED MOVING WORKING HEAD FOR IN-BODY SURGICAL PROCEDURES | [1989/41] | French: | CATHETER A TETE DE TRAVAIL MUE A VITESSE ELEVEE POUR INVESTIGATIONS CHIRURGICALES INTRA-CORPORELLES | [1989/41] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.1989 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 19.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/41] | 20.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.09.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 03.04.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.1989 | 02.01.1992 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0191630 [ ] (INTRAVASCULAR SURGICAL INSTR [US]) | by applicant | US4445509 | EP0191630 |