EP0252158 - FLASH LIGHTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHIMURA, Hajime Purinsu Vira 201 3-28-19, Minamisenzoku Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP | [1988/02] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87900688.0 | 08.01.1987 | [1988/02] | WO1987JP00011 | Priority number, date | JP19860004226 | 14.01.1986 Original published format: JP 422686 | [1988/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8704267 | Date: | 16.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0252158 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0252158 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.07.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G03B27/54 | [1988/02] | CPC: |
G03B27/542 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1988/02] | Title | German: | BLITZLICHTGERÄT | [1988/02] | English: | FLASH LIGHTING DEVICE | [1988/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ECLAIRAGE A ECLAIR | [1988/02] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.1987 | Translation filed | 02.10.1987 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.1987 | Search fee paid | 02.10.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.1987 | Examination requested [1988/02] | 23.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH05746266 ; | [Y]JPS58163948U ; | [X]JPS58195839 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [X]JPS59177532 (CANON KK); | [X]JPS60225136 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0648038 (NEW OJI PAPER CO LTD) |