EP0255831 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR DISPENSING PREDETERMINED DOSES HAVING A PRECISE WEIGHT OF A FLUID FILLING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1991 [1991/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARL EDELMANN VERPACKUNGSTECHNIK GMBH Paradiesstrasse 20 D-7920 Heidenheim/Brenz / DE | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states CARL EDELMANN VERPACKUNGSTECHNIK GMBH Paradiesstrasse 20 D-7920 Heidenheim/Brenz / DE | ||
For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | |||
Former [1988/07] | For all designated states CARL EDELMANN VERPACKUNGSTECHNIK GMBH Paradiesstrasse 20 D-7920 Heidenheim/Brenz / DE | ||
For all designated states BAYER AG D-5090 Leverkusen 1 Bayerwerk / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÖHRLE, Ernst Fliederweg 6 D-7920 Heidenheim-Oggenhausen / DE | 02 /
ANSELMINO, Claudio Heidemannstrasse 127 D-5000 Köln 30 / DE | [1988/07] | Representative(s) | Wey, Hans-Heinrich, et al c/o Kanzlei Hansmann, Vogeser und Partner Albert Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/07] | Wey, Hans-Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o Kanzlei Hansmann, Vogeser und Partner Albert Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 D-81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87901013.0 | 27.01.1987 | [1988/07] | WO1987DE00031 | Priority number, date | DE19863602493 | 28.01.1986 Original published format: DE 3602493 | [1988/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8704404 | Date: | 30.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0255831 | Date: | 17.02.1988 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0255831 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65B1/32 | [1988/07] | CPC: |
B65B1/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/13] |
Former [1988/07] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DOSIERTEN, GEWICHTSGERECHTEN ABFÜLLEN EINER VORBESTIMMTEN MENGE EINES FLIESSFÄHIGEN ABFÜLLGUTS | [1988/07] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR DISPENSING PREDETERMINED DOSES HAVING A PRECISE WEIGHT OF A FLUID FILLING MATERIAL | [1988/07] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE DOSES D'UN MATERIAU FLUIDE DE REMPLISSAGE AYANT UN POIDS PREDETERMINE | [1988/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.1987 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/07] | 11.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.10.1987 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   09.12.1987 | 28.10.1987 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   09.12.1987 | 28.10.1987 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   09.12.1987 | 28.10.1987 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   09.12.1987 | 28.10.1987 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   09.12.1987 | 28.10.1987 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   09.12.1987 | 28.10.1987 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   09.12.1987 | 28.10.1987 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   09.12.1987 | 28.10.1987 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 28.10.1987 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4381545 [ ] (BIDDLE III NICHOLAS, et al); | BE665949 [ ]; | DE2907011 [ ] (NATRONAG PAPIERPROD GMBH); | EP0032481 [ ] (JEGER M FA [CH]) | Examination | EP0234605 |