EP0256137 - BIS-DIOXOPIPERAZINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.1993 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.1993 [1993/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 2-9 Nihonbashi-Muromachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/08] | For all designated states ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-9 Nihonbashi-Muromachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKASE, Muneaki 24-13, Oizumi-machi 1-chome Nerima-ku, Tokyo 177 / JP | 02 /
CAI, Jun-Chao, c/o Zenyaku Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 33-7, Oizumi-machi 2-chome Nerima-ku, Tokyo 177 / JP | [1992/52] |
Former [1988/08] | 01 /
TAKASE, Muneaki 24-13, Oizumi-machi 1-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 177 / JP | ||
02 /
CAI, Jun-Chao Laboratory of Zenyaku Kogyo K. K. 33-7, Oizumi-machi 2-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 177 / JP | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/08] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 D-90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87901122.9 | 05.02.1987 | [1988/08] | WO1987JP00074 | Priority number, date | JP19860025191 | 07.02.1986 Original published format: JP 2519186 | [1988/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8704707 | Date: | 13.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0256137 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0256137 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.08.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D241/08, C07D405/14, // A61K31/495 ,(C07D405/14, 241:00, 307:00) | [1988/08] | CPC: |
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D241/08 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/08] | Title | German: | BIS-DIOXOPIPERAZIN-ABKÖMMLINGE | [1988/08] | English: | BIS-DIOXOPIPERAZINE DERIVATIVES | [1988/08] | French: | DERIVES DE BIS-DIOXOPIPERAZINE | [1988/08] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.1987 | Translation filed | 01.10.1987 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.1987 | Search fee paid | 01.10.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/10] | 06.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2012129 (NAT RES DEV); | [P]JPS61152660 (ZENYAKU KOGYO KK); | [A]JPH0697963 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |