EP0265445 - COMBINED HOLE MAKING AND THREADING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Turchan, Manuel C. 12825 Ford Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [1988/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/18] | Representative(s) | Bockhorni, Josef, et al Bockhorni & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Bockhorni, Josef, et al Bockhorni & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/15] | Bockhorni, Josef, Dipl.-Ing., et al Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/04] | Frohwitter, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/19] | Harrison, Michael Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87901232.6 | 27.01.1987 | [1988/18] | WO1987US00170 | Priority number, date | US19860840443 | 17.03.1986 Original published format: US 840443 | [1988/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8705546 | Date: | 24.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0265445 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0265445 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.09.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/08, B23C3/34, B23G5/20 | [1988/18] | CPC: |
B23G5/184 (EP,US);
Y10T408/9048 (EP,US);
Y10T409/30056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, LI, LU [1993/16] |
Former [1988/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTES BOHR- UND GEWINDEBOHRWERKZEUG | [1988/18] | English: | COMBINED HOLE MAKING AND THREADING TOOL | [1988/18] | French: | TARAUDEUSE ET FORET COMBINES | [1988/18] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.1988 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.1988 | Search fee paid | 12.02.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/19] | 05.04.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 10.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 10.05.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 11.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.12.1987 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   12.02.1988 | 17.12.1987 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   12.02.1988 | 17.12.1987 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   12.02.1988 | 17.12.1987 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   12.02.1988 | 17.12.1987 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   12.02.1988 | 17.12.1987 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   12.02.1988 | 17.12.1987 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   12.02.1988 | 17.12.1987 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   12.02.1988 | 17.12.1987 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   12.02.1988 | 17.12.1987 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   12.02.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0237035 (DETROIT TOOL IND [US]); | [A]FR1068255 (GOUPILLE CANNELEE) | International search | [A]US1034724 (MUELLER HENRY [US], et al); | [A]US4271554 (GRENELL DAVID); | [A]US279360 ; | [A]US4375708 (HELLNICK DIETER H, et al); | [A]JPH05524862 ; | [A]DE2427616 (KHAN SIEGFRIED [DE]); | [A]US2266338 (SHEAFFER HARRY C) |