EP0256105 - FILTER, IN PARTICULAR FOR A PAINT RECYCLING INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W. Schmidt GmbH & Co. KG Pforzheimer Strasse 46 D-7518 Bretten / DE | [1988/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHTER, Wolfgang Hawanger Strasse 21 D-8946 Memmingerberg / DE | [1988/08] | Representative(s) | Brommer, Hans Joachim, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/08] | Brommer, Hans Joachim, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Lemcke Dr.-Ing. H.J. Brommer, Postfach 40 26 D-76025 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 87901427.2 | 09.02.1987 | [1988/08] | WO1987EP00061 | Priority number, date | DE19863603946 | 07.02.1986 Original published format: DE 3603946 | [1988/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8704638 | Date: | 13.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0256105 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01D13/00, B05B15/04, B01D29/30 | [1988/08] | CPC: |
B01D39/083 (EP);
B01D63/06 (EP,US);
B01D39/086 (EP);
B05B14/463 (EP);
B01D2239/04 (EP);
B01D2239/0464 (EP);
B01D2239/065 (EP);
B01D2239/1216 (EP);
B01D2239/1233 (EP);
B01D2239/1291 (EP);
B01D2313/21 (EP);
B05B14/462 (EP);
Y02P70/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/08] | Title | German: | FILTER, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE LACKIER-RECYCLINGANLAGE | [1988/08] | English: | FILTER, IN PARTICULAR FOR A PAINT RECYCLING INSTALLATION | [1988/08] | French: | FILTRE, NOTAMMENT POUR UNE INSTALLATION DE RECYCLAGE DE PEINTURE | [1988/08] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.1987 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.1987 | Examination requested [1988/08] | 29.08.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/11] | 09.10.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US3715036 [ ] (HAMER E); | FR2306001 [ ] (MILLIPORE CORP [US]); | US4155853 [ ] (SHIPPEY FRANK R [US]); | NL7804142 [ ] (WAFILIN BV); | DE3332457 [ ] (RICHTER WOLFGANG); | US4568456 [ ] (VAN ZON CORNELIS [NL]) |