EP0305362 - FIRE RESISTANT PLASTIC STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1990 | Change - miscellaneous | published on 29.08.1990 [1990/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUITON, Jeremy, David, Lehardy Shell-Mex House Strand London WC2 / GB | [1989/10] | Representative(s) | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 2501 AN Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 87901486.8 | 13.03.1987 | [1989/10] | WO1987EP00152 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8807153 | Date: | 22.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0305362 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16L53/00, E04B1/94, E04C2/34, E04C2/52 | [1989/10] | CPC: |
F16L53/70 (EP,US);
F16L53/00 (KR,US);
F16L53/75 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/10] | Title | German: | GEGEN FEUER WIDERSTANDSFÄHIGE KUNSTSTOFFSTRUKTUR | [1989/10] | English: | FIRE RESISTANT PLASTIC STRUCTURE | [1989/10] | French: | STRUCTURE PLASTIQUE RESISTANTE AU FEU | [1989/10] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/35: Verfahren abgeschlossen infolge Verbindung mit 87200485.8/0281689 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) vom 11.07.90 | EPB 1990/35: Proceedings concluded following consolidation with 87200485.8/0281689 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 11.07.90 | EPB 1990/35: Procédure close par suite de la jonction avec la demande no. 87200485.8/0281689 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 11.07.90 | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.1988 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 15.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US1754784 [ ] (MORRIS BORSODI); | DE916252 [ ] (PHOENIX GUMMIWERKE AG); | FR2038668 [ ] (THOMSON CSF); | DE2358229 [ ] (RORAND PTY LTD); | FR2325503 [ ] (PLANET WATTOHM SA [FR]) |