EP0303697 - DERIVATIVES OF PHYSIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE SUBSTANCE K-252 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
Former [1989/08] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKATA, Chikara 2-32-3, Narusedai Machida-shi Tokyo 194 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Akira 1880-30, Kiso-machi Machida-shi Tokyo 194 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Mitsuru 3-2-6-204, Mita Tama-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 214 / JP | 04 /
KOBAYASHI, Eiji 2-11-21-706, Kurihara Adachi-ku Tokyo 123 / JP | 05 /
MORIMOTO, Makoto 1188, Shimotogari, Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun Shizuoka 411 / JP | 06 /
AKINAGA, Shiro 1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun Shizuoka 411 / JP | 07 /
HIRATA, Tadashi 1566-315, Nara-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227 / JP | 08 /
MOCHIDA, Kenichi 325-5, Sanada Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 259-12 / JP | 09 /
KASE, Hiroshi 3-35-18, Maehara-cho Koganei-shi Tokyo 184 / JP | 10 /
YAMADA, Koji 1-12-2, Asahi-machi Machida-shi Tokyo 194 / JP | 11 /
IWAHASHI, Kazuyuki 3-17, Fujimidai Kunitachi-shi Tokyo 186 / JP | [1989/08] | Representative(s) | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/27] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1989/08] | Lambert, Hugh Richmond, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 87901672.3 | 09.03.1987 | [1989/08] | WO1987JP00144 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8807045 | Date: | 22.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0303697 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0303697 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.09.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/22, A61K31/55 | [1989/08] | CPC: |
C07D498/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/08] | Title | German: | DERIVATE DES PHYSIOLOGISCH AKTIVEN MITTELS K-252 | [1989/08] | English: | DERIVATIVES OF PHYSIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE SUBSTANCE K-252 | [1989/08] | French: | DERIVES DE LA SUBSTANCE PHYSIOLOGIQUEMENT ACTIVE K-252 | [1989/08] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.1988 | Translation filed | 23.11.1988 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1988 | Search fee paid | 23.11.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/08] | 02.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/39] | Request for further processing for: | 03.06.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 03.06.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.06.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS61268687 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 105, No. 21 187430s, 1986 | [X] - Ibid, Vol. 104, No. 5, 31427q, 1985 | [X] - Ibid, Vol. 101, No. 7, 55460j, 1984 |