EP0298081 - DEVICE IN A CLAMPING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRÖNDAHL, Sven Algot Torsgatan 43 S-113 37 Stockholm / SE | [1989/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/02] | Representative(s) | Lindblad, Sture FAMTEC Box 7574 103 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | Lindblad, Sture FAMTEC Box 7574 S-103 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 87901730.9 | 27.02.1987 | [1989/02] | WO1987SE00096 | Priority number, date | SE19860000976 | 04.03.1986 Original published format: SE 8600976 | [1989/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8705250 | Date: | 11.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0298081 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0298081 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B27F7/17 | [1989/02] | CPC: |
B66F7/0633 (EP,US);
B21F33/025 (EP,US);
B66F7/08 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53709 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/02] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG FÜR EINE KLEMMASCHINE | [1989/02] | English: | DEVICE IN A CLAMPING MACHINE | [1989/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR UNE MACHINE DE FIXATION | [1989/02] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.1988 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.1987 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 11.07.1988 | Examination requested [1989/02] | 23.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.1990 | 01.03.1990 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.06.1991 | NL | 19.06.1991 | [1999/42] |
Former [1992/05] | NL | 19.06.1991 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2731353 (MARTIN FRIEDRICH); | [A]DE2937302 (HARTCO CO); | [A]DE2415958 ; | [A]FR2355626 (GORO [FR]); | [A]FR2378615 (GORO [FR]); | [A]US1048522 (GIBSON NICHOLAS E [US]); | [A]US1841217 ; | [A]US3506179 (VARGA LEROY M); | [A]US3633810 (KRAKAUER DANIEL, et al); | [A]US3698448 (SPUHL WALTER); | [A]US3773310 (CROSBY L); | [A]US3991926 (MARKS WILLIAM M); | [A]US4424929 (WEIS CHARLES W [US]); | [A]US4548241 (ZAPLETAL HENRY [US], et al) |